MA S142 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to digital right to repair. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to digital right to repair
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2478 |
2023-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2478 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H360 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
H360 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S142 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S142.pdf |