MA S1446 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to correct pension inequity for James G. Clothier. Public Service.
Title
Correcting pension inequity for James G. Clothier
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1303 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1381 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1520 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1401 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S1378 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1482 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1314 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1381 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1520 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1401 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S1378 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1482 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1314 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1446 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1446.pdf |