MA S1446 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1447
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of unmanned aerial systems. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the use of unmanned aerial systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Accompanied by S1447 |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3139 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H4047 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2020
S1447 (Replaces) 2019-11-25 - Accompanied S1446
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3139 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H4047 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2020
S1447 (Replaces) 2019-11-25 - Accompanied S1446
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1446 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1446.pdf |