MA S1446 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Accompanied H2162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Accompanied H2162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Accompanied H2162 |
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2162 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1446 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1446.pdf |