MA S1450 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to emergency response in an active shooter or hostile event situation. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to emergency response in an active shooter or hostile event situation
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-08-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-08-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3492 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2152 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2883 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2152 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2883 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1450.pdf |