MA S1453 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of lead paint on outdoor structures. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting the use of lead paint on outdoor structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2147 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3306 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5079
S560 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S547 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2594 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2932
S1099 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3306 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5079
S560 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S547 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2594 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2932
S1099 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1453 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1453.pdf |