MA S1462 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to drug recognition experts. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to drug recognition experts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1333 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3472 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S881 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3472 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S881 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1462 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1462.pdf |