MA S1475 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to restoration to service for certain retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to restoration to service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2373 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3304 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S875 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S874 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3815 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2019
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
H4010 (Similar To) 2020-12-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5170
H4042 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2019
S2360 (Similar To) 2020-03-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2020
S2402 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2020
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2373 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3304 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S875 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S874 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3815 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2019
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
H4010 (Similar To) 2020-12-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5170
H4042 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2019
S2360 (Similar To) 2020-03-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2020
S2402 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2020
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1475 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1475.pdf |