MA S1493 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to creditable service for certain public safety officers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to public safety officers and creditable service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H52 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H52 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1493 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1493.pdf |