MA S1520 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2284
Note: Legislation replaced by S2957
Note: Legislation replaced by S2957
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2957
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2957
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2957 |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read second |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2957 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Accompanied by H2284 |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1458 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2886
S1402 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2284 (Replaces) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied S1520
S2886 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2957 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1402 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2284 (Replaces) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied S1520
S2886 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2957 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1520 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1520.pdf |