MA S1521 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the effects of the Windfall Elimination Provision and Government Pension Offset in Massachusetts. Public Service.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the effects of the Windfall Elimination Provision and Government Pension Offset in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2059 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S248 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3110 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S302 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1195 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
S248 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3110 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S302 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1195 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1521 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1521.pdf |