MA S1547 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure fair public higher education workplaces. Public Service.
Title
To ensure fair public higher education workplaces
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H481 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1214 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S753 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2322 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3383 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
H1214 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S753 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H2322 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3383 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1547 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1547.pdf |