MA S1554 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2555
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to implement the recommendations of the Walsh-Kennedy Commission Report. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Implementing the recommendations of the Walsh-Kennedy Commission Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2555 |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S977 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2555 (Replaced by) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1394 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S2355 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1644 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S977 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S2555 (Replaced by) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1392 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1394 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
S2355 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1644 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1554 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1554.pdf |