MA S1559 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the PFAS Research and Development Public Safety Fund. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the establishment of the PFAS Research and Development Public Safety Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1489 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S1517 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2317 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3242 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4569
S1517 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2317 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3242 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4569
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1559 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1559.pdf |