MA S1615 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make certain changes in the bidding of public construction contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Making certain changes in the bidding of public construction contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2446 |
2011-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2011 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2446 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1615 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13781&generalCourtId=1 |