MA S1620 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand professional development for state university and community college campus police officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Expanding professional development for state university and community college campus police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S285 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1763 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H675 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
S1763 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H675 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1620 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1620.pdf |