MA S1636 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize tax free contributions to a trust for the care of incapacitated parents or guardians. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing tax free contributions to a trust for the care of incapacitated persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2549 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H597 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1636.pdf |