MA S1705 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2794
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate January as Peace Officer History Month. Public Service.
Title
Designating January as Peace Officer History Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2794 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2022 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3139 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4569
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2111 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2789 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2794 (Replaced by) 2022-03-31 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2027 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2111 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2789 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2794 (Replaced by) 2022-03-31 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1705 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1705.pdf |