MA S1725 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-21 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2077
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-21 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2077
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to permist for overweight vehicles. Transportation.
Title
To promote environmentally sound transportation of agricultural products
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Brewer [D] | Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Sen. Benjamin Downing [D] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S2077 |
2011-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1725 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9036&generalCourtId=1 |