MA S1745 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the environment and public health. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the environment and public health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S803 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S485 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S631 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S485 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S631 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1745.pdf |