MA S1756 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the transfer of boat registration between family members
Title
Relative to the transfer of boat registration between family members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1756 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10714&generalCourtId=1 |