MA S1782 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide the next of kin of a police officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty with the flags of the Commonwealth and the United States. Public Service.
Title
Providing the next of kin of a police officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty with the flags of the Commonwealth and the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | House | Accompanied H2794 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2794 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1838 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2668 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2123 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1838 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2668 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2123 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1782 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1782.pdf |