MA S2123 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to flying the flag of the Commonwealth at half-staff annually to honor the victims of the terrorist attack on September 11, 2001. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the flying of the flag of the Commonwealth at half staff on state buildings and installations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2794 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1782 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2794
S2718 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
S1782 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2794
S2718 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2123 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2123.pdf |