MA S1807 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3073
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied H3073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied H3073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect vulnerable road users. Transportation.
Title
To protect vulnerable road users
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Accompanied H3073 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3073 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1649 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S955 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1805 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S125 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1649 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S955 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1805 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S125 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1807 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1807.pdf |