MA S1809 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect youth from nicotine addiction. Revenue.
Title
Protecting youth from nicotine addiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5247 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3132 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4858
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2021
H1207 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S853 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2405 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S857 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1082 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2973 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H2310 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H3393 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H3132 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4858
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2021
H1207 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S853 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2405 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S857 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1082 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2973 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H2310 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1809 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1809.pdf |