MA S1830 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation relative to the service of civil process
Title
For legislation relative to the service of civil process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 7, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/2 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s01830.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st01/st01830.htm |