MA S1854 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an air bag on-off switch to ensure safety to women, children and individuals with medical conditions. Transportation.
Title
Provide for an air bag on-off switch to ensure safety to women, children and individuals with medical conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1760 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1680 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1799 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1837 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1754 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1680 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1799 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1837 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1754 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1854 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1854.pdf |