MA S1878 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Peru to establish a fire station construction fund. [Local Approval Received.] Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing the town of Peru to establish a fire station construction fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-01-12 | House | Enacted |
2012-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-12 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-03-14 | House | House concurred |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1878 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14966&generalCourtId=1 |