MA S1896 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a local option to allow more solar energy generation on farmlands. Revenue.
Title
Providing a local option to allow more solar energy generation on farmlands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2208 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2142 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2208 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2142 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1896.pdf |