MA S190 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to evaluate the economic impact of transportation projects. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Providing for the evaluation of the economic impact of transportation projects
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. John Fernandes [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4434 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4434 (Replaced by) 2014-09-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S190 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S190.pdf |