MA S1912 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure greater transparency and accountability in the Commonwealth’s commuter rail system. Transportation.
Title
To ensure greater transparency and accountability in the Commonwealth’s commuter rail system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2435 |
2017-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1858 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S378 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1772 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H138 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H166 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2435 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1858 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S378 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1772 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H138 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H166 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2435 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1912 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1912.pdf |