MA S1951 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2007
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on August 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Robert McMahan, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Robert McMahan, an employee of the Department of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | Senate | No further action taken |
2017-01-03 | Senate | No further action taken |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-09-03 | Governor returned with veto, for message see S2007 | |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-08-20 | House | Enacted |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-08-20 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-08-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-08-13 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Read second, amended as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-06-18 | House | House concurred |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2007 (Replaced by) 2015-09-03 - See S1951
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2095 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S1977 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - New draft substituted, see S2009
S2514 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2095 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S1977 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - New draft substituted, see S2009
S2514 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1951 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1951.pdf |