MA S2514 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Lynn Frith, an employee of the Department of Mental Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Lynn Frith, an employee of the Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-12-08 | House | House concurred |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1951 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action taken
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2095 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S1977 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - New draft substituted, see S2009
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2095 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S1977 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - New draft substituted, see S2009
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2514 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2514.pdf |