MA S1964 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2483
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance public safety by providing implied consent in cases of persons operating under the influence of drugs. Transportation.
Title
To enhance public safety by providing implied consent in cases of persons operating under the influence of drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2483 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S273 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S1989 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2092 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2103
S2139 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2261
S2218 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2106 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See S2092
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2477 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2483 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S273 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S1989 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2092 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2103
S2139 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2261
S2218 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2106 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See S2092
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2477 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2483 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1964 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1964.pdf |