MA S1972 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the safety of school children embarking and disembarking school buses. Transportation.
Title
Concerning the safety of school children embarking and disembarking school buses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2100 |
2017-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1968 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2100
S1350 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2100 (Replaced by) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1271 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2499 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1968 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2100
S1350 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2100 (Replaced by) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1271 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2499 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1972.pdf |