MA S1975 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S123
Note: Legislation replaced by S2162
Note: Legislation replaced by S2162
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - New draft substituted, see S2162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - New draft substituted, see S2162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Monday, July 25, 2011 – New draft of Senate, No. 123 reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further regulating business practices between motor vehicle dealers, manufacturers, and distributors.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2162 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table negatived |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table negatived |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Read second |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2162 |
2011-07-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-07-25 | Senate | New draft of S123 |
2011-07-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S123 (Replaces) 2011-07-25 - Accompanying a new draft, see S1975
S2162 (Replaced by) 2012-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2012
S2162 (Replaced by) 2012-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1975 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17206&generalCourtId=1 |