MA S1978 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to handicapped placards. Transportation.
Title
Relative to handicapped placards
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2484 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1041 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2110
S158 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1643 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S367 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H1981 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S158 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1643 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S367 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H1981 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2484 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1978 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1978.pdf |