MA S1987 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to waive certain chargebacks for the Dukes County Sheriff’s Regional Emergency Communication Center. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To waive chargebacks on state grants, federal grant awards, federal subgrants and subsidies for the Dukes County Sheriff’s Regional Emergency Communication Center
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1288 (Similar To) 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2024
H2046 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2046 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1987 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1987.pdf |