MA S1994 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the city known as the Town of Greenfield. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the city known as the Town of Greenfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Residue recommitted to the Senate Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee report accepted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment (Rosenberg) adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading amendment, substituting in part a new draft S2102 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read third |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2014-02-03 | House | House concurred |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1994 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1994.pdf |