MA S1998 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow for the deduction of business interest. Revenue.
Title
Allowing for the deduction of business interest
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5248 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H346 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3138 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H300 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S153 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S229 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S268 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5248 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H346 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3138 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H300 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S153 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S229 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S268 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5248 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1998 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1998.pdf |