MA S20 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require child and parent involvement in permanency and placement planning. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Requiring child and parent involvement in permanency and placement planning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S20 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S20.pdf |