MA S2008 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 9, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 9, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts GI bill to provide tuition and fee waivers for National Guard members and veterans
Title
Establish the Massachusetts GI bill to provide tuition and fee waivers for National Guard members and veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 9, 2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 30, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/24 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02008.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02008.htm |