MA S2010 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2018
Note: Replaces legislation S2007
Note: Replaces legislation S2007
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call 71 [24-10]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call 71 [24-10]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Tuesday, September 13, 2011– New draft reported from the committee on Ways and Means for Senate, No. 2007.
Title
Providing for additional pension reform and benefits modernization
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-15 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call 71 [24-10] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2018 |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read third |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-09-15 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2007 |
2011-09-15 | Senate | SWM amendments adopted, as amended |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #43 (Brewer) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Chandler) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #35 (Tolman) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #36 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Donnelly) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #44 (Keenan) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #42 (Knapik) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #41 (Knapik) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #40 (Keenan) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #38 (Keenan) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #37 (Spilka) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #34 (Keenan) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Finegold) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Keenan) adopted - Roll Call 70 [34-0] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #22 (Jehlen) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Clark) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Creem) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #30 (Hart) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Spilka) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #29 (Donnelly) adopted - Roll Call 69 [34-0] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Tolman) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Jehlen) rejected - Roll Call 68 [14-20] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #19 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Jehlen) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Creem) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Creem) adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Donnelly) rejected - Roll Call 67 [14-20] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Donnelly) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Donnelly) rejected - Roll Call 66 [12-22] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Rodrigues) rejected |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Michael Moore) adopted - Roll Call 65 [34-0] |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read second |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2007 |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2018 (Replaces) 2011-11-14 - Reported by S2065
S2007 (Replaces) 2011-09-15 - New draft substituted, see S2010
S2007 (Replaces) 2011-09-15 - New draft substituted, see S2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2010 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17360&generalCourtId=1 |