MA S2029 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - New draft substituted, see S2250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - New draft substituted, see S2250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to acquire certain parcels of land in the city of Worcester. Transportation.
Title
Authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to acquire certain parcels of land in the city of Worcester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2250 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Read second |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2250 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-01-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2011-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-10-05 | House | House concurred |
2011-09-12 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2011-09-12 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Same As/Similar To
S2250 (Replaced by) 2012-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 211 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2029 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17349&generalCourtId=1 |