MA S2045 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public bidding. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to public bidding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3918 (Similar To) 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 304 of the Acts of 2022
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1944 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S324 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3918 (Similar To) 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 304 of the Acts of 2022
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2048 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1944 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S324 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2045.pdf |