MA S2055 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2284
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - New draft (Humason) substituted, see S2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - New draft (Humason) substituted, see S2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Easthampton to grant eight additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Easthampton to grant eight additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | New draft (Humason) substituted, see S2284 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read third |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-11-17 | House | House concurred |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2284 (Replaced by) 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2016
S30 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2075 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2015
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1797 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S2376 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S30 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2075 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 166 of the Acts of 2015
S1675 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1797 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S2376 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2055 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2055.pdf |