MA S2063 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent shackling and promote safe pregnancies for female inmates
Title
To prevent shackling and promote safe pregnancies for female inmates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment, see S2104 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-26 | House | Passed to be engrossed 146 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 307) |
2014-03-26 | House | Text of an amendment adopted (H3987) |
2014-03-26 | House | Consolidated with H3978 |
2014-03-26 | House | Read third |
2014-03-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #279 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2012 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2012 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2063 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2063.pdf |