MA S2068 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Tuesday, November 15, 2011 – New draft of Senate, No. 1972 reported from the
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jacqueline Enno, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-11-16 | House | Enacted |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-11-15 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1972 |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1972 |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2068 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17623&generalCourtId=1 |