MA S2070 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a public protection division within the department of revenue. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing a public protection division within the department of revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2681 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
H2956 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1920 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1881 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2681 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1878 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
H2956 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1920 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1881 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2681 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1878 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2070 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2070.pdf |