MA S2089 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the financial condition of the city of North Adams. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the financial condition of the city of North Adams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-06-04 | House | Enacted |
2014-06-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-05-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-05-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-04-14 | House | House concurred |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2089 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2089.pdf |